EP3460536 - ELECTRONIC MIRROR WITH AN ENHANCED SWITCHABLE LENS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visteon Global Technologies, Inc. One Village Center Drive Van Buren Township, MI 48111-5711 / US | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINDORF, Paul 1641 West Lake Drive NOVI, MI Michigan 48377 / US | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 18195828.1 | 20.09.2018 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | US201715710018 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: US201715710018 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460536 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/11, B60R1/04, B60R1/08, B60R1/12, G02F1/1335, G02B5/08 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G02F1/133536 (EP,US);
B60R1/04 (CN,US);
B32B33/00 (CN);
B60R1/08 (CN);
B60R1/088 (US);
B60R1/12 (EP,CN,US);
G02B1/11 (EP,US);
G02B5/08 (EP,US);
G02F1/133502 (EP,US);
G02F1/133526 (US);
G02F1/133528 (CN);
G02F1/139 (EP,US);
B32B2307/42 (CN);
B32B2605/08 (CN);
B60R2001/1215 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHER SPIEGEL MIT EINEM VERBESSERTEN ABSCHALTBAREN LINSENSYSTEM | [2019/13] | English: | ELECTRONIC MIRROR WITH AN ENHANCED SWITCHABLE LENS SYSTEM | [2019/13] | French: | MIROIR ÉLECTRONIQUE AVEC SYSTÈME DE LENTILLE COMMUTABLE AMÉLIORÉE | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 27.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/35] | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010277786 (ANDERSON JOHN S [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0282]; figures 6, 53a-b, 54a-b; table 2b *; | [A]US2014340728 (TAHERI BAHMAN [US]) [A] 1-9* figures 1-6 * |