EP3460761 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, IMAGE PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAMA, Yasufumi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Canon Europe Limited European Intellectual Property Group 4 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Garner, Jonathan Charles Stapleton Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 18196071.7 | 21.09.2018 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | JP20170182795 | 22.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017182795 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460761 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00, G06T15/20, H04N13/00 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G06T15/205 (EP,US);
H04N13/282 (KR);
G06T15/00 (CN);
H04N13/111 (EP,US);
G06T15/20 (US);
G06T17/00 (EP,US);
G06T17/20 (US);
G06T17/205 (KR);
G06T7/55 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
H04N13/00 (US);
H04N13/189 (KR);
H04N13/293 (KR);
H04N23/90 (US);
G06T2207/10028 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2019/13] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, IMAGE PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | [2019/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE ET PROGRAMME | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 27.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 19.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013321396 (KIRK ADAM [US], et al); | [XI]US2014354632 (ALJ YOUSSEF [FR], et al); | [AD]JP5945255B ; | by applicant | JPS5945255B |