EP3461102 - NOTIFICATION CONTROL DEVICE, NOTIFICATION CONTROL SYSTEM, NOTIFICATION CONTROL METHOD, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Hiroyuki c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Isamu c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | 03 /
SUEKI, Masanori c/o Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Naka-cho 2-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2020/45] |
Former [2019/13] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18196201.0 | 24.09.2018 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | JP20170184651 | 26.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017184651 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3461102 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3461102 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, // H04W12/10, G05B19/418 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G05B19/4185 (EP);
G05B23/027 (CN);
H04L41/06 (US);
G05B19/048 (US);
H04L63/1416 (EP,US);
G05B19/418 (US);
G05B2219/24024 (US);
G05B2219/25009 (US);
G05B2219/31121 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BENACHRICHTIGUNGSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BENACHRICHTIGUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM, BENACHRICHTIGUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2019/13] | English: | NOTIFICATION CONTROL DEVICE, NOTIFICATION CONTROL SYSTEM, NOTIFICATION CONTROL METHOD, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2019/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE NOTIFICATION, SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE NOTIFICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE NOTIFICATION ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 27.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2018 | AL | 04.11.2020 | AT | 04.11.2020 | CY | 04.11.2020 | CZ | 04.11.2020 | DK | 04.11.2020 | EE | 04.11.2020 | ES | 04.11.2020 | FI | 04.11.2020 | HR | 04.11.2020 | IT | 04.11.2020 | LT | 04.11.2020 | LV | 04.11.2020 | MC | 04.11.2020 | MK | 04.11.2020 | MT | 04.11.2020 | NL | 04.11.2020 | PL | 04.11.2020 | RO | 04.11.2020 | RS | 04.11.2020 | SE | 04.11.2020 | SI | 04.11.2020 | SK | 04.11.2020 | SM | 04.11.2020 | BG | 04.02.2021 | NO | 04.02.2021 | GR | 05.02.2021 | IS | 04.03.2021 | PT | 04.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 24.09.2018 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
MK | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 24.09.2018 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 04.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2017142144 (WEINBERGER MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071] * * figure 1 *; | [A] - JOHAN ÅKERBERG ET AL, "Efficient integration of secure and safety critical industrial wireless sensor networks", EURASIP JOURNAL ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING, (20111201), vol. 2011, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1687-1499-2011-100, XP055530786 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1687-1499-2011-100 |