EP3489448 - SLIDING DOOR SEAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Athmer oHG Sophienhammer 59757 Arnsberg / DE | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dörfer, Ralf Marktstraße 25 59609 Anröchte / DE | 02 /
Ludwig, Maico Walburger Straße 2 59494 Soest / DE | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Rolf, Gudrun Gudrun Rolf, LI.M., Rechtsanwältin Ritterstraße 19 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | Rolf, Gudrun Rosenstein, Rolf, Frohoff Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Ritterstrasse 19 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2019/22] | Rolf, Gudrun Rechtsanwältin Rosenstein, Rolf, Frohoff Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwalt Partnerschaft mbB, Nickelstrasse 21 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 18196293.7 | 24.09.2018 | [2019/22] | Priority number, date | DE201710127642 | 23.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017127642 | [2019/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489448 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3489448 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/46 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
E06B3/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHIEBETÜRDICHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/22] | English: | SLIDING DOOR SEAL SYSTEM | [2019/22] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ POUR PORTE COULISSANTE | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 28.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | ES | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | HR | 11.01.2023 | IT | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | NL | 11.01.2023 | PL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | RS | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | SM | 11.01.2023 | NO | 11.04.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | IE | 24.09.2023 | LU | 24.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | FR | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
IT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
IE | 24.09.2023 | ||
LU | 24.09.2023 | ||
FR | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
IT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
IE | 24.09.2023 | ||
LU | 24.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
IT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
LU | 24.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
IT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
LU | 24.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
LU | 24.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 11.01.2023 | |
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 11.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE8126649U (SCHEIBER, BERNDT, DE) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 * [I] 3-14; | [XI]DE202008012162U (SCHREIBER BERND [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure 4 * [I] 3-14; | [I]KR200443659Y (KIM Y S) [I] 1-14* the whole document * |