EP3628220 - A CUFF FOR USE WITH AN INFLATION-BASED NON-INVASIVE BLOOD PRESSURE MEASUREMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUENEN, Maarten Petrus Joseph c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LAMICHHANE, Bishal c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/14] | Application number, filing date | 18196774.6 | 26.09.2018 | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628220 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/022, A61B5/0225, A61B5/0235 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/02225 (EP,US);
A61B5/02233 (EP,US);
A61B5/0225 (EP);
A61B5/0235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANSCHETTE ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINER NICHT-INVASIVEN BLUTDRUCKMESSVORRICHTUNG AUF BASIS VON AUFBLASEN | [2020/14] | English: | A CUFF FOR USE WITH AN INFLATION-BASED NON-INVASIVE BLOOD PRESSURE MEASUREMENT APPARATUS | [2020/14] | French: | BRASSARD À UTILISER AVEC UN APPAREIL DE MESURE DE LA PRESSION ARTÉRIELLE NON INVASIF BASÉ SUR L'INSUFFLATION | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE2265110 (SPEIDEL BLASIUS) [X] 1,5,8,9 * figures 1, 5-8; claim 1 * [I] 2-4,6,7,10-14; | [XI]US6450966 (HANNA D ALAN [US]) [X] 1-3,6,9 * abstract * * column 5, line 65 - column 7, line 63 * [I] 1,4,5,7,8,10-14; | [I]US2012330112 (LAMEGO MARCELO [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] , [0 31] - [0043] - [0 55] *; | [XA]CN206315082U (SHI ZHEN) [X] 1,5,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * [A] 2-4,6,7,9-14; | [XAI]WO2018064217 (PHYSIO CONTROL INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0048] * [A] 10-14 [I] 2-8 |