EP3462346 - DESIGN SUPPORT DEVICE AND DESIGN SUPPORT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2019/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITABAYASHI, Yuki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
ONODERA, Makoto c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
KONGOU, Chikara c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
SHINTANI, Masaki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 05 /
QI, He c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | [2019/14] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2019/14] | Application number, filing date | 18196836.3 | 26.09.2018 | [2019/14] | Priority number, date | JP20170187680 | 28.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017187680 | [2019/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3462346 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, G06Q10/06 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06316 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063118 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06312 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0635 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] |
Former [2019/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTWURFSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ENTWURFSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/14] | English: | DESIGN SUPPORT DEVICE AND DESIGN SUPPORT METHOD | [2019/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRISE EN CHARGE DE CONCEPTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRISE EN CHARGE DE CONCEPTION | [2019/14] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 16.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1814069 (RICOH KK [JP]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0 13] - [0063]; figures 1, 2, 7, 9, 18-28; claims 1-11, 14 * * the whole document *; | [I]US2016011916 (YAGI YUJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0009]; figure 1; claims 9, 10, 13 ** the whole document *; | [I]US2017017912 (TERAGUCHI KIYOSHI [JP]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0041]; figures 1, 2, 10; claim 1 * * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2007058409 | JP2010160546 | JP2011198300 |