EP3442302 - RANDOM ACCESS METHOD AND RADIO COMMUNICATION TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optis Wireless Technology, LLC P.O. Box 250649 Plano, TX 75025 / US | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Jun c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Managment Co. Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NISHIO, Akihiko c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Managment Co. Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MIYOSHI, Kenichi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Managment Co. Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 18197109.4 | 28.02.2005 | [2019/07] | Priority number, date | JP20040065625 | 09.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004065625 | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3442302 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3442302 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, // H04W36/16, H04W74/00 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W72/21 (BR,US);
H04W72/0446 (BR,KR,US);
H04W72/04 (BR,US);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04W72/543 (BR,US);
H04W72/56 (BR,US);
H04W74/004 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W88/08 (BR,KR,US);
H04W36/16 (EP,BR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | Direktzugriffsverfahren und Funkkommunikationsendgerätevorrichtung | [2023/40] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS METHOD AND RADIO COMMUNICATION TERMINAL DEVICE | [2019/07] | French: | Procédé d'accès aléatoire et terminal de communication radio | [2023/40] |
Former [2019/07] | DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2019/07] | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE ET TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION RADIO | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 09.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05719646.1 / EP1715709 | EP13162780.4 / EP2615883 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19820684 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP1211837 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]WO2004019630 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) | by applicant | JP2001268051 | JP2004065625 |