EP3447771 - MANAGING ELECTRICAL POWER FOR A NUCLEAR REACTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NuScale Power, LLC 6650 SW Redwood Lane, Suite 210 Portland, OR 97224 / US | [2021/34] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states NuScale Power, LLC 1100 NE Circle Blvd., Suite 200 Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOUGH, Ted 1100 NE Circle Blvd Suite 200 Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18197137.5 | 03.12.2013 | [2019/09] | Priority number, date | US201261733258P | 04.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261733258 P | US201313795911 | 12.03.2013 Original published format: US201313795911 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447771 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G21D3/04, H02J9/06, G21D1/00 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
G21D3/04 (EP,US);
G21D1/00 (EP,US);
H02J3/0073 (US);
H02J9/06 (US);
H02J9/062 (EP);
H02J2310/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] |
Former [2019/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG DER STROMLEISTUNG EINES KERNREAKTORSYSTEMS | [2019/09] | English: | MANAGING ELECTRICAL POWER FOR A NUCLEAR REACTOR SYSTEM | [2019/09] | French: | GESTION DE L'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE POUR SYSTÈME DE RÉACTEUR NUCLÉAIRE | [2019/09] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 07.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/26] | 25.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.02.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13875875.0 / EP2929614 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005227017 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040]; figure 8 *; | [I] - Kuljit Hara ET AL, "Draft Standard Criteria for Class 1E Power Systems for Nuclear Power 3 Generating Stations", (20120731), URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stampPDF/getPDF.jsp?tp=&arnumber=6280573, (20160617), XP055281534 [I] 1-15 * figure 2A * | [T] - Bansi R. Patel ET AL, "IEEE Std 1184 (TM) -2006 IEEE Guide for Batteries for Uninterruptible Power Supply Systems IEEE Power Engineering Society Sponsored by the Stationary Battery Committee", (20060929), URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stampPDF/getPDF.jsp?tp=&arnumber=1707466, (20160617), XP055281691 [T] * Sections 5.1, 5.2 * | [T] - Epri, "Valve Regulated Lead Acid (VRLA) Battery Qualification Assessment", (20091106), URL: http://www.epri.com/abstracts/Pages/ProductAbstract.aspx?ProductId=000000000001019216, (20160620), XP055281723 [T] * abstract * |