Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11154266 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2021 | B2 | US2020100753 | 02.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18197212 | 27.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3628229 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2021 | B1 | EP3628229 | 01.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18197212 | 27.09.2018 |