EP3473529 - HOLDING DEVICE FOR PIVOTABLY SUPPORTING A DRIVER'S CAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Str. 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus Österreich GesmbH Schönauerstraße 5 4400 Steyr / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gazic, Zeljko Kirchmairstr. 15 80686 München / DE | 02 /
Schindlegger, Markus Ennserstraße 7 4300 St. Valentin / AT | 03 /
Wührleitner, Gerhard Schlühslmayrstraße 81 4400 Steyr / AT | 04 /
Mucha, David Tulbingerkogel 77 3001 Mauerbach / AT | 05 /
Nosratpur, Keivan c/o Ürküt Säulenstr. 2 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/17] | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18197828.9 | 01.10.2018 | [2019/17] | Priority number, date | AT20170000409 | 17.10.2017 Original published format: AT 4092017 | [2019/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473529 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3473529 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15, B62D33/067, // B62D33/06 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
B62D33/067 (EP,AT,CN);
B62D21/15 (EP);
B60R19/34 (AT);
B60R19/56 (AT);
B62D33/0608 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] |
Former [2019/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HALTEVORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHWENKBAREN HALTEN EINES FAHRERHAUSES | [2019/17] | English: | HOLDING DEVICE FOR PIVOTABLY SUPPORTING A DRIVER'S CAB | [2019/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN DESTINÉ À MAINTENIR PIVOTANTE UNE CABINE DU CONDUCTEUR | [2019/17] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 14.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21176528.4 / EP3892525 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2018 | AL | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | ES | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | LU | 01.10.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 01.10.2018 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 01.10.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 01.10.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 01.10.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 01.10.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 21.07.2021 | |
NO | 21.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0972700 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [A] 1,13* paragraphs [0036] , [0039] - [0042] - [0047]; figures 2-6; claims 1-3 *; | [XA]DE10037889 (THYSSEN KRUPP AUTOMOTIVE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0017] , [0018]; figure 1; claims 1,2,4,5 * [A] 3,9,11,12; | [X]WO03101809 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,8,13-15 * page 6, lines 23-33 * * page 7, lines 6-14 * * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 8; figures 1,3,8 *; | [X]WO2016041590 (KONGSBERG AUTOMOTIVE AS [NO]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10,13-15 * page 24, paragraph 5 - page 26, paragraph 1; figures 8,9; claims 1,2 * |