EP3444199 - PRODUCT AND PACKAGE WITH A PHOTOSENSITIVE USE-EVIDENT FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. One Michael Owens Way Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOPER, Scott 26765 Carronde Drive 3101 Perrysburg, OH Ohio 43551 / US | 02 /
FEYGENSON, Oleg 15-33 Vozrojdenia Str. Saint Petersburg / RU | 03 /
BRYANT, Jessica, R. 3563 Queenswood Blvd. Toledo, OH Ohio 43606 / US | 04 /
CLARK, Terence, J. 3655 N. Sunset Way Sanford, MI Michigan 48657 / US | 05 /
ANDERSON, Chris, D. 278 Cedar Ridge Court Perrysbug, OH Ohio 43551 / US | 06 /
SOLUNIN, Anatoly 38-1-289 Korablestroiteley Str. Saint Petersburg / RU | 07 /
SMITH, Roger, P. 831 Bridgeton Lane Perrysburg, OH Ohio 43551 / US | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 18198336.2 | 05.11.2013 | [2019/08] | Priority number, date | US201213679506 | 16.11.2012 Original published format: US201213679506 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3444199 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3444199 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D49/00, B65D51/24, B65D55/02 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
B65D55/026 (EP,US);
B65D51/248 (US);
B65B43/00 (US);
B65D25/00 (US);
B65D49/00 (US);
B65D81/00 (US);
B65D2203/00 (EP,US);
B65D2203/02 (EP,US);
B65D2203/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2019/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PRODUKT UND PACKUNG MIT EINER LICHTEMPFINDLICHEN GEBRAUCHSNACHWEISFUNKTION | [2019/08] | English: | PRODUCT AND PACKAGE WITH A PHOTOSENSITIVE USE-EVIDENT FEATURE | [2019/08] | French: | PRODUIT ET EMBALLAGE DOTÉ D'UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE PHOTOSENSIBLE DE PREUVE D'UTILISATION | [2019/08] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 21.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13805633.8 / EP2920083 | EP17183307.2 / EP3263476 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US520219 (W.B. & W.H. RAND) [A] 6* page 1, line 67 - line 83; figure 7 *; | [A]US2143508 (COLLENS WILLIAM S) [A] 1 * figures 1, 5; claim 1 *; | [A]CN1431130 (QIU ZHIMING [CN]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [E]WO2014149803 (OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER [US]) [E] 1,2 * page 16, line 1 - page 18, line 2; figures 12-13 * | by applicant | US2515936 | US2515937 | US3325299 | US3399811 | US4740401 | EP2920083 | EP2920083 | EP3263476 |