Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
01.07.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.01.2021 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.11.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.08.2020 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
01.05.2020 | First examination report | |
30.04.2020 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.12.2019 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
05.12.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
05.12.2019 | Change - designated states | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
02.12.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant | |
19.04.2019 | Publication of search report | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
19.04.2019 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
19.04.2019 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
18.01.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
06.10.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.10.2018 | Change - representative |