Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3445002 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3445002



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 627
08.07.2020 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.08.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.06.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.06.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.06.2019 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
18.06.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.06.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 78
18.06.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 78
04.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.06.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
04.06.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
04.06.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
04.06.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
04.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.06.2019 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
02.04.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.04.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.04.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.04.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 78
02.04.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 78
11.03.2019 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee (divisional application) Search / examination 2
01.03.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
01.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.02.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
23.01.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.12.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 European search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
03.12.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
04.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
04.10.2018 Description Search / examination 59
04.10.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
04.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 16
04.10.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
03.03.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 87
03.03.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 80