EP3502217 - LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarz, Andrew Infineum UK Ltd P.O. Box PO Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BD / GB | 02 /
Hartweg, Manuel Mile End Rd London, Greater London E1 4NS / GB | 03 /
Becer, Remzi London Queen Mary University Mile End Road London, Greater London E1 4NS / GB | 04 /
Phillips, Daniel Infineum UK Ltd. PO Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, OX13 6BB / GB | 05 /
Strong, Anthony James Infineum UK Ltd PO Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | 06 /
Cattoz, Beatrice Infineum UK Ltd PO Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Capaldi, Michael Joseph, et al P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 18199179.5 | 08.10.2018 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | EP20170204463 | 29.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17204463 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502217 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3502217 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C10M149/12, C10M169/04 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
C10M149/12 (EP,US);
C10M107/44 (KR);
C08G73/0233 (US);
C10M107/02 (KR);
C10M169/041 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,US);
C10M2205/003 (US);
C10M2207/125 (KR);
C10M2217/044 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (US);
C10M2223/00 (EP,US);
C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10N2020/067 (US);
C10N2020/073 (US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2030/68 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2217/044, C10N2020/04, C10N2020/073 (US,EP);
C10M2217/044, C10N2020/067 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2019/26] | English: | LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITIONS | [2019/26] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'HUILE DE LUBRIFICATION | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 23.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2018 | AL | 27.05.2020 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | IE | 08.10.2020 | LU | 08.10.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.10.2018 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MT | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.10.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 08.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4120804 (SMITH WILLIAM L, et al) [AD] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]JP2003261678 (KAWAMURA INST CHEM RES) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [AP]EP3257921 (INFINEUM INT LTD [GB]) [AP] 1-13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * example -; claim - *; | [A] - BECK M ET AL, "POLYOXAZOLINE AUF FETTCHEMISCHER BASIS", ANGEWANDTE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE. APPLIED MACROMOLECULARCHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (19941201), vol. 223, doi:10.1002/APMC.1994.052230116, ISSN 0003-3146, pages 217 - 233, XP000482386 [A] 1-13 * page 218 - page 220 * * tables 1,3 * * page 228 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/apmc.1994.052230116 | by applicant | US27145 | US3024195 | US3024237 | US3087936 | US3113986 | US3154560 | US3172892 | US3202678 | US3216936 | US3219666 | US3254025 | US3634595 | US3670054 | US3700633 | US4120804 | US4867890 | EP2090642 | - HOOGENBOOM et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed, (20090000), vol. 48, pages 7978 - 7994 |