EP3470137 - PROCESS FOR CONVERTING HYDROCARBON FEEDSTOCKS USING A DEVICE COMPRISING SIDE INJECTIONS OF LIQUID TO LIMIT THE PHENOMENA OF SOLID DEPOSITS IN EQUIPMENT WITH A CONICAL BOTTOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/16] | DEVICE COMPRISING SIDE INJECTIONS OF LIQUID TO LIMIT THE PHENOMENA OF SOLID DEPOSITS IN EQUIPMENT WITH A CONICAL BOTTOM | ||
[2023/46] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBLARD, Benjamin 0020 Rue Claude Veyron 69007 Lyon / FR | 02 /
MARQUES, Joao 10 allée Bellechasse 38670 Chasse sur Rhone / FR | 03 /
LE COZ, Jean-François 2 quater rue Bonnemin 78100 Saint Germain en Laye / FR | [2023/48] |
Former [2019/16] | 01 /
AMBLARD, Benjamin 0020 RUE CLAUDE VEYRON 69007 LYON / FR | ||
02 /
MARQUES, JOAO 10 allée Bellechasse 38670 CHASSE SUR RHONE / FR | |||
03 /
LE COZ, Jean-François 2 quater rue Bonnemin 78100 SAINT GERMAIN EN LAYE / FR | Representative(s) | IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize BP3 69360 Solaize / FR | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 18199193.6 | 08.10.2018 | [2019/16] | Priority number, date | FR20170059606 | 13.10.2017 Original published format: FR 1759606 | [2019/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3470137 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3470137 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C10G75/00, B01J19/24, B01J19/26, C10G47/26, C10G51/04, C10G65/10, C10G65/12, C10G67/04 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
C10G75/00 (EP,US);
B01J19/00 (BR);
B01J19/24 (EP,RU,US);
B01J8/228 (CN);
B01D3/00 (CN);
B01J19/2465 (EP,US);
B01J19/26 (EP,US);
B01J8/085 (US);
B01J8/1881 (CN);
C10G47/26 (EP,RU,US);
C10G51/04 (EP,US);
C10G65/10 (EP,US);
C10G65/12 (EP,US);
C10G67/049 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00893 (US);
B01J2219/00247 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00252 (EP,US);
B01J2219/185 (EP,US);
B01J2219/1943 (EP,US);
B01J2219/1946 (EP,US);
C10G11/18 (BR);
|
Former IPC [2019/16] | B01J19/24, B01J19/26, C10G47/26, C10G51/04, C10G65/10, C10G65/12, C10G67/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2019/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEINSÄTZEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG MIT SEITLICHEN FLÜSSIGKEITSEINSPRITZUNGEN ZUR BEGRENZUNG DER PHÄNOMENE DER ABLAGERUNGEN VON FESTKÖRPERN IN GERÄTEN MIT KONISCHEM BODEN | [2023/46] | English: | PROCESS FOR CONVERTING HYDROCARBON FEEDSTOCKS USING A DEVICE COMPRISING SIDE INJECTIONS OF LIQUID TO LIMIT THE PHENOMENA OF SOLID DEPOSITS IN EQUIPMENT WITH A CONICAL BOTTOM | [2023/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION DE CHARGES HYDROCARBONÉES METTANT EN OEUVRE UN DISPOSITIF COMPRENANT DES INJECTIONS LATÉRALES DE LIQUIDE POUR LIMITER LES PHÉNOMÈNES DE DÉPÔTS SOLIDES DANS LES ÉQUIPEMENTS A FOND CONIQUE | [2023/48] |
Former [2019/16] | VORRICHTUNG MIT SEITLICHEN FLÜSSIGKEITSEINSPRITZUNGEN ZUR BEGRENZUNG DER PHÄNOMENE DER ABLAGERUNGEN VON FESTKÖRPERN IN GERÄTEN MIT KONISCHEM BODEN | ||
Former [2019/16] | DEVICE COMPRISING SIDE INJECTIONS OF LIQUID TO LIMIT THE PHENOMENA OF SOLID DEPOSITS IN EQUIPMENT WITH A CONICAL BOTTOM | ||
Former [2019/16] | DISPOSITIF COMPRENANT DES INJECTIONS LATERALES DE LIQUIDE POUR LIMITER LES PHENOMENES DE DEPOTS SOLIDES DANS LES EQUIPEMENTS A FOND CONIQUE | Examination procedure | 03.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 17.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3846079 (ALAGY J, et al); | [XA]US4146359 (LUMPKIN ROBERT E, et al); | [A]US6238912 (MOORE PHILIP COLEY [GB], et al); | [XYI]US2016346758 (KRESS DON EDWARD [CA], et al) |