EP3636938 - EXPANSION ANCHOR WITH FORWARDS AND REARWARDS GROOVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstr. 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimahara, Hideki Spitalstrasse 33 9472 Grabs / CH | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18199323.9 | 09.10.2018 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636938 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/06 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
F16B13/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPREIZDÜBEL MIT VORWÄRTS- UND RÜCKWÄRTSRILLEN | [2020/16] | English: | EXPANSION ANCHOR WITH FORWARDS AND REARWARDS GROOVES | [2020/16] | French: | CHEVILLE À EXPANSION COMPRENANT DES RAINURES VERS LE AVANT ET VERS L'ARRIÈRE | [2020/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 23.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017343026 (SCHAEFFER MARC [CH]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20180065019 (HAEFELE BERLIN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]CN108474400 (HILTI AG) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2256822 | DE3411285 | EP0515916 | EP2848825 | WO2017067945 |