EP3498228 - POROUS IMPLANT STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [2024/08] |
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARP, Jeffrey 379 Fountain Crest Dr. Memphis, TN Tennessee 38120 / US | 02 /
JANI, Shilesh 6657 Vinings Creek Cove Memphis, TN Tennessee 38119 / US | 03 /
GILMOUR, Laura 1759 Crump Ave Memphis, TN Tennessee 38107 / US | 04 /
LANDON, Ryan 7552 Winners Circle East Southhaven, MS Mississippi 7552 / US | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2024/08] |
Former [2019/25] | Secerna LLP The Catalyst Baird Lane, Heslington East York YO10 5GA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18199395.7 | 19.08.2010 | [2019/25] | Priority number, date | US20090235269P | 19.08.2009 Original published format: US 235269 P | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3498228 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3498228 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/56, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, B33Y80/00, A61F2/28, A61F2/30, B33Y70/10 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/06 (KR);
A61L27/42 (KR);
A61L27/56 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y70/10 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3028 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30593 (US);
A61F2002/30914 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/3092 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30962 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2230/0063 (EP,KR,US);
A61L24/0036 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | A61F2/28, A61L27/56, A61F2/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/05] |
Former [2019/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PORÖSE IMPLANTATSTRUKTUREN | [2019/25] | English: | POROUS IMPLANT STRUCTURES | [2019/25] | French: | STRUCTURES D'IMPLANT POREUSES | [2019/25] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/05] | 19.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10810598.2 / EP2467096 | Divisional application(s) | EP24155651.3 / EP4353479 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1683593 (HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP [US]) | by applicant | US4863538 | US4944817 | US5017753 | US5076869 | US2006147332 | US2010010638 | WO2011022550 | US20090260811 |