EP3636793 - EB-PVD-LIKE PLASMA-SPRAYED COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dama, Christoffer Franklinstr. 16 10587 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Zois, Dimitrios Otto-Shur-Allee 106 10585 Berlin / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18199594.5 | 10.10.2018 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636793 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/02, C23C4/11, C23C4/134 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
C23C4/134 (EP);
C23C4/02 (EP);
C23C4/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EB-PVD-ÄHNLICHE PLASMAGESPRITZTE BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2020/16] | English: | EB-PVD-LIKE PLASMA-SPRAYED COATINGS | [2020/16] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS SIMILAIRES EB-PVD PROJETÉS AU PLASMA | [2020/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 05.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005129965 (BARBEZAT GERARD [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0017] - [0022]; claims 1-8 * [I] 2,4; | [A]US2007259173 (REFKE ARNO [CH], et al) [A] 2* paragraph [0026]; claims 1, 6, 13 *; | [XI]US2009136781 (DAMANI RAJIV J [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0042] , [0 44] , [0 46] , [0 66] , [0 67]; figures 1, 2; claims 1, 7 * [I] 2,4; | [XI]US2012231211 (VON NIESSEN KONSTANTIN [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0044] - [0050] - [0 63] * [I] 2,4; | [XI]US2012308733 (VON NIESSEN KONSTANTIN [CH], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 45] - [0053]; figure 1 * [I] 2; | [XI]US2013224432 (HOSPACH ANDREAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 29] - [0032] - [0 57] , [0 66]; figure 1 * [I] 2; | [XI]WO2018146156 (OERLIKON METCO AG WOHLEN [CH]) [X] 1,3,5 * pages 9-10 * * pages 14-15 * [I] 2,4 |