EP3477807 - BUS BAR ARRANGEMENT WITH CURRENT GUIDING PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/18] | BUS BAR ARRANGEMENT AND CURRENT GUIDING PROFILE FOR SAME | ||
[2023/30] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wago Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH Hansastrasse 27 32423 Minden / DE | [2023/50] |
Former [2019/18] | For all designated states Wago Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH Hansastrasse 27 32423 Minden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIES, Henryk Zur Alten Bäckerei 4 04249 Leipzig / DE | 02 /
GASSAUER, Stephan Neue Marktstraße 13 99768 Ilfeld / DE | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Plathnerstraße 3A 30175 Hannover / DE | [2023/50] |
Former [2019/18] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 18199620.8 | 10.10.2018 | [2019/18] | Priority number, date | DE201710125263 | 27.10.2017 Original published format: DE102017125263 | [2019/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3477807 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3477807 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02G5/04, H02G5/02, // H01R25/14 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
H02G5/04 (EP);
H02G5/025 (EP);
H01R25/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | H02G5/02, H01R25/14, H02G5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STROMSCHIENENANORDNUNG MIT STROMFÜHRUNGSPROFIL | [2023/30] | English: | BUS BAR ARRANGEMENT WITH CURRENT GUIDING PROFILE | [2023/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RAIL CONDUCTEUR AVEC PROFIL D'AMENÉE DE COURANT | [2023/30] |
Former [2019/18] | STROMSCHIENENANORDNUNG UND STROMFÜHRUNGSPROFIL HIERFÜR | ||
Former [2019/18] | BUS BAR ARRANGEMENT AND CURRENT GUIDING PROFILE FOR SAME | ||
Former [2019/18] | DISPOSITIF DE RAIL CONDUCTEUR ET PROFIL D'AMENÉE DE COURANT CORRESPONDANT | Examination procedure | 01.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 01.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | IT | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 13.12.2023 | |
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]FR2432756 (TOURTELLIER SA ETS) [I] 1-4 * page 3, line 14 - line 15; figure . * * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 7 * [A] 12; | [XI]DE3311362 (MANNESMANN AG) [X] 1,4-6,11 * paragraphs [0007] , [00 9]; figure . * [I] 2,3; | [A]US5618192 (DRURY LEE [AU]) [A] 14* figures 1, 2, 28 *; | [XA]WO0191250 (ZUMTOBEL STAFF GMBH [AT], et al) [X] 1,4,7-9,11 * figures 1, 3, 6 * [A] 10,12; | [I]US2011261508 (ROSS STEVEN L [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0055]; figure 1A *; | [XI]CN103318056 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,4,10,12 * figure . * [I] 14-17 |