EP3470448 - SILICON-CONTAINING COMPOUND, URETHANE RESIN, STRETCHABLE FILM, AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATAKEYAMA, Jun c/o New Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata / JP | 02 /
HARADA, Yuji c/o New Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata / JP | 03 /
NONAKA, Shiori c/o New Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata / JP | 04 /
MITSUI, Ryo c/o New Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata / JP | 05 /
WATANABE, Osamu c/o New Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata / JP | [2021/01] |
Former [2019/16] | 01 /
Hatakeyama, Jun c/o New Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata / JP | ||
02 /
Harada, Yuji c/o New Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata / JP | |||
03 /
Nonaka, Shiori c/o New Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata / JP | |||
04 /
Mitsui, Ryo c/o New Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata / JP | |||
05 /
Watanabe, Osamu c/o New Functional Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-ku, Joetsu-shi Niigata / JP | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18199711.5 | 10.10.2018 | [2019/16] | Priority number, date | JP20170199397 | 13.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017199397 | [2019/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3470448 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3470448 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/61, C07F7/08, C08G18/75, C09D175/16, C08G77/458 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
C07F7/0834 (EP,US);
C07F7/089 (KR);
C08G18/3893 (US);
C07F7/081 (US);
C07F7/0838 (US);
C08G18/3895 (KR);
C08G18/61 (EP,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,US);
C08G18/8175 (KR);
C08G77/458 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C09D175/16 (EP,US);
C08J2375/04 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] |
Former [2019/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SILICIUMHALTIGE VERBINDUNG, URETHANHARZ, DEHNBARE FOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG DAVON | [2019/16] | English: | SILICON-CONTAINING COMPOUND, URETHANE RESIN, STRETCHABLE FILM, AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE SAME | [2019/16] | French: | COMPOSÉ CONTENANT DU SILICIUM, RÉSINE D'URÉTHANE, FILM ÉTIRABLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION | [2019/16] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 15.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.10.2018 | AL | 30.12.2020 | AT | 30.12.2020 | CY | 30.12.2020 | CZ | 30.12.2020 | DK | 30.12.2020 | EE | 30.12.2020 | ES | 30.12.2020 | FI | 30.12.2020 | HR | 30.12.2020 | IT | 30.12.2020 | LT | 30.12.2020 | LV | 30.12.2020 | MC | 30.12.2020 | MK | 30.12.2020 | PL | 30.12.2020 | RO | 30.12.2020 | RS | 30.12.2020 | SE | 30.12.2020 | SI | 30.12.2020 | SK | 30.12.2020 | SM | 30.12.2020 | BG | 30.03.2021 | NO | 30.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | IS | 30.04.2021 | PT | 30.04.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 10.10.2018 | |
AL | 30.12.2020 | ||
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
SM | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CY | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
MC | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SI | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
ES | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
DK | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
IT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 30.12.2020 | |
AT | 30.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 30.04.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
PL | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 30.12.2020 | |
CZ | 30.12.2020 | ||
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
EE | 30.12.2020 | ||
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 30.12.2020 | |
FI | 30.12.2020 | ||
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RO | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
SK | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LT | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
HR | 30.12.2020 | ||
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
LV | 30.12.2020 | ||
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
SE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 30.12.2020 | |
RS | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4839443 (AKUTSU YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * examples 1-7 *; | [A]JPH0597868 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-10* formulas 1-13 * | by applicant | JP2583412B | JP2624060B | JP2004033468 | JP2011194757 | JP2012152725 | JP2013139534 |