Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
08.11.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.10.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.03.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
10.10.2018 | Change - representative |