EP3636972 - MULTI-WAY DIVERTER VALVE FOR A DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kepinska, Justyna Zuzanna Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) / IT | 02 /
Markiewicz, Bartlomiej Stanislaw Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) / IT | 03 /
Rejdych, Rafal Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) / IT | 04 /
Vallejo, Alvaro Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) / IT | 05 /
Varvate, Subhash Nivrutti Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) / IT | 06 /
Wolowicz, Mateusz Michal Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) / IT | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Spina, Alessandro Whirlpool Management EMEA S.R.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | Spina, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA SpA Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 18199751.1 | 10.10.2018 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636972 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/076, A47L15/42, F16K11/20, F16K11/24, // D06F39/08 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
F16K11/202 (EP);
A47L15/4221 (EP);
F16K11/076 (EP);
F16K11/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRWEG-UMLEITVENTIL FÜR GESCHIRRSPÜLER | [2020/16] | English: | MULTI-WAY DIVERTER VALVE FOR A DISHWASHER | [2020/16] | French: | SOUPAPE DE DÉRIVATION À ORIFICES MULTIPLES POUR LAVE-VAISELLE | [2020/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 09.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0383028 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]US2003168087 (INUI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [XA]DE10246407 (ELBI INT SPA [IT]) [X] 13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0045] - [0051]; figures 1,10-12 * [A] 1-12,14; | [XA]DE102009028454 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0060]; figure - * [A] 1-12; | [IA]WO0022973 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [I] 13,15 * abstract * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 27; figure - * [A] 1-12,14; | [A]US2010043840 (KIM SEONG HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] - [0049]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2017130849 (DEMITROFF DANRICH HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0705561 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US7445013 | US7523758 | US2012138106 |