EP3450651 - FLOOR PANEL FOR FORMING A COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GERFLOR 50, Cours de la République 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CEYSSON, Olivier Chemin de la Levade 84500 Bollène / FR | 02 /
CHAMMAS, Bertrand 32 Avenue Gabriel Péri 69370 Saint-Didier-au-Mont-d'Or / FR | [2023/14] |
Former [2019/10] | 01 /
CEYSSON, Olivier Chemin de la Levade 84500 BOLLENE / FR | ||
02 /
CHAMMAS, Bertrand 32 Avenue Gabriel Péri 69370 SAINT-DIDIER-AU-MONT-D'OR / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras CS 70 203 15 rue Camille de Rochetaillée 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [2023/14] |
Former [2019/10] | Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 place de l'Hotel de Ville CS 70203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18199985.5 | 25.08.2015 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | FR20140057957 | 25.08.2014 Original published format: FR 1457957 | [2019/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450651 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3450651 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, E04F15/10 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
E04F15/02038 (EP,CN,US);
E04F15/105 (EP,CN,US);
E04F2201/013 (US);
E04F2201/0138 (US);
E04F2201/0146 (EP,CN,US);
E04F2201/023 (US);
E04F2201/03 (US);
E04F2201/04 (US);
E04F2201/042 (US);
E04F2201/043 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2019/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BODENPLATTE FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG EINES BELAGS | [2019/10] | English: | FLOOR PANEL FOR FORMING A COATING | [2019/10] | French: | PANNEAU DE SOL POUR LA REALISATION D'UN REVÊTEMENT | [2019/10] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 17.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15763051.8 / EP3186458 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | IE | 25.08.2023 | LU | 25.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
IE | 25.08.2023 | ||
LU | 25.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
LU | 25.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
LU | 25.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
LU | 25.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19718319 (MANKO ERICH [DE]) [A] 7 * figures 9, 10 *; | [Y]DE20206751U (KRONOSPAN TECH CO LTD [CY]) [Y] 1-6,8,9 * page 36, lines 20-28; figure 16 * * page 37, line 30 - page 38, line 2; figure 17 *; | [A]US7121058 (PALSSON JORGEN [SE], et al) [A] 1-6,8,9 * figure 5 *; | [A]WO2009061279 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-6,8,9 * figures 1a-c *; | [A]US2010031594 (LIU DAVID C [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 16, 17, 34-37 *; | [A]WO2012001503 (KREAFIN GROUP SA [LU], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2013309441 (HANNIG HANS-JUERGEN [DE]) [Y] 1-6,8,9 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 36] , [0 55]; figures 3a-c * | by applicant | GB2256023 | EP1026341 | WO0153628 | WO0177461 | EP1190149 | WO2012004701 | US2013309441 |