13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
09.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
17.06.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.03.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
09.07.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
07.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.07.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.04.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.03.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
05.03.2021 |
Change - English title |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
05.03.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
03.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.10.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.10.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
30.10.2020 |
Change - designated states |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
20.03.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
19.02.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|