EP3451789 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR SHARING FUNCTION OF EXTERNAL DEVICE THROUGH COMPLEX NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Seung-dong 104-503 Daerim e-Pyeonhansesang 1 Danji Apt Won-dong, Osan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
CHANG, Woo-yong 4306-1603 Dongbaek-Jigu Eoeunmok Maeul, Koaroo Apt, Jung-dong Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
PARK, Se-jun 103-2101 Daewoo Apt Dongcheon-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
MOON, Min-jeong No 2608 Timebridge bldg 154-1 Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18200761.7 | 23.08.2010 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | KR20090077874 | 21.08.2009 Original published format: KR 20090077874 | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3451789 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3451789 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/06, // H04W88/04, H04W84/18, H04W8/00, H04L29/08 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (KR);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/563 (EP,US);
H04W92/18 (KR);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR GEMEINSAMEN NUTZUNG EINER EXTERNEN VORRICHTUNG ÜBER EIN KOMPLEXES NETZWERK | [2019/10] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR SHARING FUNCTION OF EXTERNAL DEVICE THROUGH COMPLEX NETWORK | [2019/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR PARTAGER LA FONCTION D'UN DISPOSITIF EXTERNE DANS UN RÉSEAU COMPLEXE | [2019/10] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 15.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10173739.3 / EP2288227 | Divisional application(s) | EP20159429.8 / EP3675595 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2010 | AL | 26.02.2020 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | IE | 23.08.2020 | LU | 23.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | FR | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.08.2010 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 23.08.2020 | ||
LU | 23.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 23.08.2020 | ||
LU | 23.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 23.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 23.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 23.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1865687 (KONINKL KPN NV [NL]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 2-4 * * claims 1-8 *; | [XP]WO2009151452 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,5,9-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0032] ** figures 1A, 1B, 2 *; | [XI] - DELPHINANTO A ET AL, "Proxying UPnP service discovery and access to a non-IP Bluetooth network on a mobile phone", COMMUNICATIONS AND VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY IN THE BENELUX, 2007 14TH IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071115), ISBN 978-1-4244-1369-0, pages 1 - 5, XP031339000 [X] 1,8-15 * abstract * * II Proxy server definition and architecture (pages 1-2) * * IV Implementation (pages 3-4) * * figures 1,2 * [I] 1-15 |