EP3453437 - WATER TOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Marketing Enterprise (GME) Ltd. P.O. Box 25202 6125101 Tel Aviv / IL | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weisman, Zafrira P.O. Box 25202 6125101 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
Zanger, Israel P.O. Box 25202 6125101 Tel Aviv / IL | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18201271.6 | 10.09.2015 | [2019/11] | Priority number, date | US201462048694P | 10.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462048694 P | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3453437 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3453437 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63H23/00, A63H23/10, B05B7/00, B05B7/30, B05B9/00, F41B9/00, A63H23/14 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
A63H23/14 (EP,KR,US);
A63H23/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Title | German: | WASSERSPIELZEUG | [2019/11] | English: | WATER TOY | [2019/11] | French: | JOUET AQUATIQUE | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 02.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15840310.5 / EP3191198 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01297026 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [I]JPH0284915 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [I] 1,2,11-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5251345 (PECHNER MURRAY [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 22 - column 4, line 65; figures 1-12 * |