EP3473919 - VEHICLE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIKATA, Satoshi STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo, 153-8636 / JP | 02 /
MIURA, Hiroshi STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo, 153-8636 / JP | 03 /
MORITA, Keiji STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo, 153-8636 / JP | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/17] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18201452.2 | 19.10.2018 | [2019/17] | Priority number, date | JP20170204166 | 23.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017204166 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473919 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F21S43/14, F21S43/241, F21S43/243, // F21Y105/18, F21Y113/10 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
B60Q1/2607 (US);
B60Q1/34 (US);
B60Q1/44 (US);
F21S43/241 (EP,US);
F21S43/243 (EP,US);
F21S43/30 (US);
B60Q2400/20 (EP,US);
F21W2103/20 (US);
F21W2103/35 (US);
F21Y2105/18 (EP,US);
F21Y2107/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2019/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLAMPE | [2019/17] | English: | VEHICLE LAMP | [2019/17] | French: | LAMPE DE VÉHICULE | [2019/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 22.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2354637 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 7 * [I] 3-7; | [XI]DE102010056311 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0041] * * figure 6 * [I] 2,3; | [XI]DE102012017596 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0046] * * figure 3 * [I] 2,3,6,7; | [XI]DE102015108486 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0039] * * figure 5 * [I] 2,6,7; | [XI]WO2017059431 (EMERGENCY TECH INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 4,5 *[I] 2,3 | by applicant | JP5563209B |