EP3643747 - TRANSPARENT AND FLEXIBLE BLENDS OF PMMA AND POLYCARBONATE-SILOXANE COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIN, Christopher Luke SABIC 1 Lexan Ln Mt. Vernon, IN 47620 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Hao SABIC 1 Lexan Ln Mt.Vernon, IN 47620 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Bing SABIC 1 Lexan Ln Mt.Vernon, IN 47620 / US | 04 /
CHELLAMUTHU, Manojkumar SABIC 1 Lexan Ln Mt.Vernon, IN 47620 / US | 05 /
VOLLENBERG, Peter SABIC 1 Lexan Ln Mt.Vernon, IN 47620 / US | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18201736.8 | 22.10.2018 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643747 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/12 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
C08L33/12 (EP,US);
C08L83/10 (US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08J2333/12 (US);
C08J2383/10 (US);
C08J2433/12 (US);
C08J2483/10 (US);
C08L2201/08 (US);
C08L2203/16 (EP,US);
C08L2203/30 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L33/12, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L33/12, C08L83/10 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTE UND FLEXIBLE MISCHUNGEN AUS PMMA UND POLYCARBONAT-SILOXAN-COPOLYMER | [2020/18] | English: | TRANSPARENT AND FLEXIBLE BLENDS OF PMMA AND POLYCARBONATE-SILOXANE COPOLYMER | [2020/18] | French: | MÉLANGES TRANSPARENTS ET FLEXIBLES DE PMMA ET DE COPOLYMÈRE DE POLYCARBONATE-SILOXANE | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/14] | 19.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1627897 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-8,10,12,13 * examples 12,15 * [I] 9,11; | [XI]EP2455426 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]) [X] 1-8,10,12,13 * examples 1-3,7 * [I] 9,11,14,15; | [A]WO2013190474 (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL]) [A] 14 * paragraph [0167] *; | [A]WO2017149457 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL])[A] 15 | by applicant | US2004039145 | US6723864 | WO2008042500 | WO2010076680 | US8466249 | WO2016174592 |