EP3480481 - A DOUBLE CLUTCH ACTIVATION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Otomotiv Sanayi Anonim Sirketi Akpinar Mahallesi Hasan Basri Cadessi No: 2 34885 Sancaktepe/Istanbul / TR | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZCAN, Sezgin Ford Otomtiv Sanayi Anonim Sirketi Akp nar Mahallesi Hasan Basri Caddesi No:2 Sancaktepe 34885 ISTANBUL / TR | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Dericioglu, E. Korhan Ankara Patent Bureau Mustafa Kemal Mahallesi Dumlupinar Bulvari Eskisehir Yolu 9.km No:274/7 B Blok 14. Kat No:161 06530 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Dericioglu, E. Korhan Ankara Patent Bureau Limited Kavaklidere Mahallesi Bestekar Caddesi No: 10 06680 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 18201801.0 | 22.10.2018 | [2019/19] | Priority number, date | TR20170016967 | 01.11.2017 Original published format: TR 201716967 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480481 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/38, F16D21/06, F16D23/12 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
F16D21/06 (EP);
F16D23/12 (EP);
F16D2021/0684 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2019/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELKUPPLUNGBETÄTIGUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2019/19] | English: | A DOUBLE CLUTCH ACTIVATION MECHANISM | [2019/19] | French: | MÉCANISME D'ACTIONNEMENT D'EMBRAYAGE DOUBLE | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 09.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]DE102006008226 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1-4,11,12,14,15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-4 * [A] 5-10,13; | [A]DE102011076542 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]FR3008755 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 7 - page 10, line 34; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | US6012561 | US2007240530 | CN105114583 |