|
27.07.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2022 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2022 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.11.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2021 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.05.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
07.05.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
24.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2019 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
80 |