EP3643713 - HETEROCYCLIC KINASE INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iOmx Therapeutics AG Fraunhoferstrasse 13 82152 Martinsried / DE | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sennhenn, Peter c/o iOmx Therapeutics AG Fraunhoferstrasse 13 82152 Martinsried / DE | 02 /
Meier-Ewert, Sebastian c/o iOmx Therapeutics AG Fraunhoferstrasse 13 82152 Martinsried / DE | 03 /
Khandelwal, Nisit c/o iOmx Therapeutics AG Fraunhoferstrasse 13 82152 Martinsried / DE | 04 /
Bancroft, David c/o iOmx Therapeutics AG Fraunhoferstrasse 13 82152 Martinsried / DE | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Kuttenkeuler, David SKM-IP PartGmbB Oberanger 45 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Müller, Christian Stefan Gerd ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18202164.2 | 23.10.2018 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643713 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, A61P35/00, A61K31/506 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61P35/00 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] |
Former [2020/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE KINASEHEMMER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2020/18] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC KINASE INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF | [2020/18] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE KINASE HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 29.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006081172 (IRM LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claim -; table 1 *; | [A]WO2008033746 (CURIS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* claim - * | by applicant | US4439196 | US4447233 | US4447224 | US4475916 | US4486194 | US4487603 | US4522811 | US4596556 | US4790824 | US4941880 | US5064413 | US5312335 | US5374548 | US5383851 | US5399163 | US5399331 | US5416016 | US2011318373 | - ARAUJO et al., Lancet Oncol., (20130000), vol. 14, page 13017 | - ARAUJO et al., Cancer, (20120000), vol. 118, page 63 | - EVENS et al., Annal. Onc., (20170000), vol. 28, page 354 | - The Targeted Agent and Profiling Utilization Registry, URL: https://www.tapur.org, NCT02693535 | - ROSSARI; ORCIUOLO, J. Hemat. Oncol., (20180000), vol. 11, page 84 | - JABBOUR et al., Leukemia, (20060000), vol. 20, page 1767 | - MANLEY et al., Biochem. Biophys. Acta, (20050000), vol. 1754, page 3 | - HUGHES et al., Leukemia, (20150000), vol. 29, page 1832 | - NICOLINI et al., Blood, (20090000), vol. 114, page 5271 | - BANTSCHEFF et al., Nat. Biotech., (20070000), vol. 25, page 1035 | - ANASTASSIADIS et al., Nat. Biotech., (20120000), vol. 29, page 1039 | - OZANNE et al., Biochem. J., (20150000), vol. 465, page 271 | - WEI et al., J. Hemat. Oncol., (20100000), vol. 3, page 47 | - BABEI et al., Drug Des. Dev. Thera., (20160000), vol. 10, page 2443 | - WOODMAN et al., J. Clin. Onc., (20090000), vol. 27, page 9019 | - GALANIS; LEVIS, Haematologica, (20150000), vol. 100, page e89 | - KATOH et al., Mol. Cell. Endocrinol., (20040000), vol. 217, page 109 | - WEIN et al., Nature Commun., (20160000), vol. 7, page 13176 | - SELVIK et al., PLoS ONE, (20140000), vol. 9, page e112485 | - Pharmacological/Toxicity Review and Evaluation of NDA 21-986, page 31 | - MANNING et al., Science, (20021206), vol. 298, no. 5600, pages 1912 - 1934 | - BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - STREJAN et al., J. Neuroimmunol., (19840000), vol. 7, page 27 | - V.V. RANADE, J. Clin. Pharmacol., (19890000), vol. 29, page 685 | - UMEZAWA et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19880000), vol. 153, page 1038 | - P.G. BLOEMAN et al., FEBS Lett., (19950000), vol. 357, page 140 | - M. OWAIS et al., Antimicrob. Agents Chemother., (19950000), vol. 39, page 180 | - BRISCOE et al., Am. J. Physiol., (19950000), vol. 1233, page 134 | - YANG et al., Blood, (20120000), vol. 120, page 4533 | - DENG et al., Hybrid Hybridomics, (20040000), vol. 23, page 176 | - LOWE et al., Oncoimmunology, (20140000), vol. 3, page e27589 | - "UniProt", Database accession no. Q9Y2K2 | - LIZCANO, J. M. et al., EMBO J., (20040000), vol. 23, pages 833 - 843 | - TATUSOVA; MADDEN, FEMS Microbiol Lett, (19990000), vol. 174, pages 247 - 250 | - "UniProt", Database accession no. P57059 | - "UniProt", Database accession no. Q9HOKI | - PENNICA et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 312, pages 724 - 9 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. P01375 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. Q06599 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. P51742 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. P13296 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. P51435 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. P19101 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. P29553 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. P06804 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. Q8HZD9 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. P23563 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. P04924 | - "UniProtKB/Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. P16599 | - SMITH; BAGLIONI, J Biol Chem, (19870000), vol. 262, pages 6951 - 4 | - KRIEGLER et al., Cell, (19880000), vol. 53, pages 45 - 53 | - FLICK; GIFFORD, J Immunol Methods, (19840000), vol. 68, pages 167 - 75 | - DOBRZYCKA et al., Eur Cytokine Netw, (20090000), vol. 20, page 131 | - AYDIN et al., Turk J Med Sci, (20120000), vol. 42, page 762 | - REISSFELDER et al., J Clin Inv, (20150000), vol. 125, page 739 | - WANG; LIN, Acta Pharmacol Sin, (20080000), vol. 28, page 1275 | - FERRERO et al., Am J Physiol Cell Physiol, (20010000), vol. 281, page C1173 | - ETEMADI et al., FEBS J, (20130000), vol. 280, page 5283 | - BERNT et al., Cancer Res, (20050000), vol. 65, page 4343 | - KAUFMAN et al., Nature Rev Drug Disc, (20150000), vol. 14, page 642 | - SONG et al., Oncotarget., (20150000), vol. 6, page 21533 | - FOGLIETTA et al., Bone Marrow Transplant, (20130000), vol. 48, page 269 | - ZHU et al., Biomed Pharmacother, (20090000), vol. 63, page 509 | - REDMOND et al., Cancer Immunol Res., (20140000), vol. 2, page 142 | - MAUTE, PNAS, (20150000), vol. 112, page E6506 | - CHANG et al., Anyeg Chem Int, (20150000), vol. 54, page 11760 | - ZAK et al., Oncotarget, (20160000), vol. 7, page 30323 | - SKALNIAK et al., Oncotarget, (20170000), vol. 8, page 72167 | - POWDERLY, Ann One, vol. 28, no. 5 | - KARAMAN et al., Nat Biotech, (20080000), vol. 26, page 127 | - KHANDELWAL et al., EMBO Mol Med, (20150000), vol. 7, page 540 | - GIBBONS et al., PNAS, (20140000), vol. 111, page 3550 | - DONATO et al., Cancer Res, (20040000), vol. 64, page 672 | - WU et al., Leukemia, (20100000), vol. 24, page 869 | - LIU et al., Cancer Cell, (20100000), vol. 17, page 333 | - PUTTINI et al., Cancer Res, (20060000), vol. 66, page 11314 | - FAUVEL et al., Am J Can Sci, (20130000), vol. 2, page 28 | - HEKIM et al., Can Imm Res, (20170000), vol. 5, page 157 | WO2018EP60172 |