EP3643899 - A PISTON FOR A COMPRESSION IGNITION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Request for conversion to national application | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCEMA, Mr. Massimo C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 02 /
ROSSI, Mr. Dario C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 03 /
RUSTICI, Mr. Giorgio C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 04 /
SARETTO, Mr. Roberto C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | De Bonis, Paolo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18202373.9 | 24.10.2018 | [2020/18] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643899 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02B23/06, F02F3/26 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
F02B23/0672 (EP);
F02F3/28 (CN);
F02B23/06 (EP);
F02B23/0693 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOLBEN FÜR EINEN KOMPRESSIONSZÜNDUNGSVERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2020/18] | English: | A PISTON FOR A COMPRESSION IGNITION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2020/18] | French: | PISTON POUR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE À ALLUMAGE PAR COMPRESSION | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 06.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/43] | 17.06.2021 | Request for conversion into a national application, for IT [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005115538 (ONO YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0051]; figure 10 *[A] 2-14; | [XI]DE102009018485 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 * [I] 4,8,10-14; | [XI]DE102015012541 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]WO2017152203 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-3,5-10,15 * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 35; figures 2, 13 * [I] 4,11-14 |