Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3454227 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3454227



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 874
25.10.2022 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.10.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.10.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.10.2022 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
14.03.2022 Annex to the communication Search / examination 13
14.03.2022 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.10.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.10.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.10.2021 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
10.08.2021 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
05.08.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.08.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.08.2021 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.04.2021 Annex to the communication Search / examination 13
15.04.2021 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.04.2021 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.09.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
13.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
13.09.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
13.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.06.2019 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Search / examination 1
06.06.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.05.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
18.03.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
13.02.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
12.02.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 6
12.02.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
12.02.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 The request for correction will be decided by the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.11.2018 Annex Search / examination 4
26.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
26.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.11.2018 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 2
20.11.2018 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
25.10.2018 Description Search / examination 180
25.10.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
25.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 47
25.10.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
09.08.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 312
09.08.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 220