EP3643368 - FITNESS EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heartcore Fitness Ltd 11 Stratford Road London W8 6RF / GB | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Randolph F. 23662 Bulson Rd. Mount Vernon, WA 98274 / US | 02 /
SCHURING, Jess 11 Stratford Road LONDON W8 6RF / GB | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Marconnet, Sébastien Cabinet Sébastien Marconnet 1 Quinquies rue Basse de la Terrasse (Bâtiment A) 92190 Meudon / FR | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18202744.1 | 26.10.2018 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643368 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3643368 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/02, A63B22/00, A63B21/04, A63B21/00 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
A63B21/00065 (EP);
A63B21/023 (EP);
A63B21/0428 (EP);
A63B21/4033 (EP);
A63B21/4034 (EP);
A63B22/0089 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] |
Former [2020/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FITNESSAUSRÜSTUNG | [2020/18] | English: | FITNESS EQUIPMENT | [2020/18] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT DE FITNESS | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 16.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2018 | AL | 14.07.2021 | AT | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | CZ | 14.07.2021 | DK | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | ES | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | IT | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | MT | 14.07.2021 | NL | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RO | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SE | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IE | 26.10.2021 | LU | 26.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 26.10.2018 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IE | 26.10.2021 | ||
LU | 26.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 26.10.2018 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IE | 26.10.2021 | ||
LU | 26.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IE | 26.10.2021 | ||
LU | 26.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IE | 26.10.2021 | ||
LU | 26.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
LU | 26.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
LU | 26.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
LU | 26.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6371895 (ENDELMAN KEN [US], et al) [X] 1,4,10-12 * column 12, line 61 - column 13, line 8; figure - * [I] 9; | [X]US7803095 (LAGREE SEBASTIEN A [US]) [X] 1,3,4,10-12 * column 11, lines 10-38; figure - *; | [X]US9022909 (KERMATH MARIA JOANNA [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8,10-12 * column 8, line 41 - column 9, line 13; figure - *; | [XI]EP2946816 (BALANCED BODY INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; figure - * [I] 7,8,12; | [XI]US2018207469 (ARONSON JUDITH MIRIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10-12 * paragraph [0174]; figure - *[I] 9 |