EP3477680 - CRYOTRANSFER HOLDER AND WORKSTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gatan, Inc. 780 Commonwealth Drive Warrendale, PA 15086 / US | [2022/52] |
Former [2019/18] | For all designated states Gatan, Inc. 780 Commonwealth Drive Warrendale, PA 15086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gubbens, Alexander Jozef 441 Channing Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
Hunt, John Andrew 350 Britto Terrace Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 03 /
Azimi, Masoud 3765 Branding Iron Ct Dublin, CA 94568 / US | 04 /
Pantelic, Radosav Bleichestrasse 23 4058 Basel BS / CH | 05 /
Zolkowski, Ron 120 Skylark Drive Glenshaw, PA 15116 / US | 06 /
Booth, Chris 814 Los Alamos Avenue Livermore, CA 94550 / US | [2022/52] |
Former [2019/18] | 01 /
Gubbens, Alexander Jozef 441 Channing Avenue Palo Alto, CA California 94301 / US | ||
02 /
Hunt, John Andrew 350 Britto Terrace Fremont, CA California 94539 / US | |||
03 /
Azimi, Masoud 3765 Branding Iron Ct Dublin, CA California 94568 / US | |||
04 /
Pantelic, Radosav Bleichestrasse 23 4058 Basel BS / CH | |||
05 /
Zolkowski, Ron 120 Skylark Drive Glenshaw, PA Pennsylvania 15116 / US | |||
06 /
Booth, Chris 814 Los Alamos Avenue Livermore, CA California 94550 / US | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 18202746.6 | 26.10.2018 | [2019/18] | Priority number, date | US201762579040P | 30.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762579040 P | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3477680 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3477680 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/20, G01N1/42 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
H01J37/20 (EP,US);
G01N23/20025 (US);
G01N1/42 (EP,US);
H01J2237/0216 (EP,US);
H01J2237/2001 (EP,US);
H01J2237/2005 (EP,US);
H01J2237/2007 (US);
H01J2237/20207 (US);
H01J2237/204 (EP,US);
H01J37/26 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] |
Former [2019/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KRYOTRANSFERHALTERUNG UND ARBEITSSTATION | [2019/18] | English: | CRYOTRANSFER HOLDER AND WORKSTATION | [2019/18] | French: | SUPPORT DE CRYOTRANSFERT ET POSTE DE TRAVAIL | [2019/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 30.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22215538.4 / EP4174903 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | AT | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | ES | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | IT | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH04135153U (?????) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-6; | [XA]WO2009145377 (KOREA BASIC SCIENCE INST [KR], et al) [X] 1,9 * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 1 * * page 6, line 13 - line 23 * * page 11, line 10 - page 14, line 8 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2-6; | [XAI]US2012112064 (NAGAKUBO YASUHIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0065] - [0070] - [0079] - [0089] - [0122] - [0125]; figures 4,6,7,13,14 * [A] 2-6 [I] 7,8; | [XA]US2013014528 (STABACINSKIENE HALINA [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] * [A] 2-6; | [XA]JP6127191B (MELBIL CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *[A] 2-6 |