EP3480066 - MULTIPLE PIVOT ROLLOVER PROTECTION STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayefske, Mark John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, Mannheim Regional Center, Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Ressler, Kyle John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, Mannheim Regional Center, Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Herzmann, Matthew John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, Mannheim Regional Center, Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Knight, Dan John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, Mannheim Regional Center, Global IP Services John-Deere-Str. 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Lavall, Christian Henner John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 18202780.5 | 26.10.2018 | [2019/19] | Priority number, date | US201715797427 | 30.10.2017 Original published format: US201715797427 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480066 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3480066 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/13 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
B60R21/131 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0018 (US);
B60R2021/0081 (US);
B62D1/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] |
Former [2019/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERROLLSCHUTZSTRUKTUR MIT MEHREREN GELENKEN | [2019/19] | English: | MULTIPLE PIVOT ROLLOVER PROTECTION STRUCTURE | [2019/19] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PROTECTION CONTRE LE RENVERSEMENT À PIVOT MULTIPLE | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 08.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2018 | AL | 09.12.2020 | AT | 09.12.2020 | CY | 09.12.2020 | CZ | 09.12.2020 | DK | 09.12.2020 | EE | 09.12.2020 | ES | 09.12.2020 | FI | 09.12.2020 | HR | 09.12.2020 | IT | 09.12.2020 | LT | 09.12.2020 | LV | 09.12.2020 | MC | 09.12.2020 | MK | 09.12.2020 | NL | 09.12.2020 | PL | 09.12.2020 | RO | 09.12.2020 | RS | 09.12.2020 | SE | 09.12.2020 | SI | 09.12.2020 | SK | 09.12.2020 | SM | 09.12.2020 | BG | 09.03.2021 | NO | 09.03.2021 | GR | 10.03.2021 | IS | 09.04.2021 | PT | 09.04.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 26.10.2018 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
ES | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
IT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
NL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US3259211 (RYSKAMP NEIL J) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 45; figures 1, 3 * [A] 5 [I] 3; | [XA]US5788452 (BROUWER GERARDUS J [CA], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 57; figures 1, 2, 3, 4 * [A] 2-5; | [A]EP1870298 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US4949991 | US5503430 | US5779272 | US5839758 | US9511735 | US9616837 |