EP3502408 - WIRED DRILL PIPE HAVING CONDUCTIVE END CONNECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelliserv International Holding, Ltd MCCS, P.O. Box 309GT Ugland House, South Church Street George Town, Grand Cayman / KY | [2022/50] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Intelliserv International Holding, Ltd MCCS, P.O. Box 309GT Ugland House, South Church Street George Town, Grand Cayman / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Madhavan, Raghu 120-16 Yamate-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, 231 0862 / JP | 02 /
Li, Qiming 127 Wilkins Crossing Sugar Land Texas, 77479 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/50] |
Former [2019/26] | Rankin, Douglas Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18203479.3 | 15.09.2009 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | US200823748808 | 25.09.2008 Original published format: US 23748808 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502408 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3502408 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/02, B23P11/00, H01R13/02, E21B17/20 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
E21B17/0285 (EP,US);
E21B17/003 (EP,US);
E21B17/042 (EP,US);
E21B17/206 (EP,US);
Y10S439/95 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] |
Former [2019/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERDRAHTETES BOHRGESTÄNGE MIT LEITFÄHIGEN ENDANSCHLÜSSEN | [2019/26] | English: | WIRED DRILL PIPE HAVING CONDUCTIVE END CONNECTIONS | [2019/26] | French: | TIGE DE FORAGE CÂBLÉE À CONNEXIONS D'EXTRÉMITÉ CONDUCTRICES | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 31.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09839017.2 / EP2334891 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | ES | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | IT | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | NL | 14.12.2022 | PL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3518609 (FONTENOT JOHN E JR) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XI]US3696332 (DICKSON LEON L JR, et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * column 2, line 23 - line 53; figures 1,2 * [I] 4,5,8; | [X]US2004242044 (HEAD PHILIP [GB]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2005074988 (HALL DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2005074998 (HALL DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1* figures 1-5; claims 1,14 * | by applicant | US3696332 | US5339037 | US6717501 | US6929493 | US2006225926 |