EP3480557 - METHOD FOR MEASURING A WORKPIECE USING A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexagon Metrology GmbH Siegmund-Hiepe-Strasse 2-12 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirchhof, Michael c/o Hildegard Kirchhof Untere Johannisbergstrasse 4 35745 Herborn / DE | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Knefel, Cordula Wertherstrasse 16 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 18203643.4 | 31.10.2018 | [2019/19] | Priority number, date | DE201710125677 | 03.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017125677 | [2019/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480557 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/04, G01B5/008, G05B19/404, B23Q17/20, G05B19/401 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
G01B5/008 (EP);
G01B21/045 (EP);
G05B19/401 (EP);
G05B2219/50137 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] |
Former [2019/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES MIT EINEM KOORDINATENMESSGERÄT | [2019/19] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING A WORKPIECE USING A COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINE | [2019/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'UNE PIÈCE À USINER À L'AIDE D'UN APPAREIL DE MESURE DE COORDONNÉES | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 30.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2004055170 (GRZESIAK JEAN-LOUIS [GB], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-4D * [Y] 1-13; | [IY]US2015241194 (NAKAGAWA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 1-13; | [Y]US2013185948 (RACINE PAUL P [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1A-1B *; | [A]US2010018069 (OULD JOHN CHARLES [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-2A * |