EP3477610 - ISOLATOR CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Fire & Security GmbH Victor von Bruns-Strasse 21 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEAH, Faruk 21 Sundridge Road Woking, GU22 9AU Surrey / GB | 02 /
NAISH, Andrew 28 High Street Standwell Village Staines, TW19 7JS Surrey / GB | 03 /
BENNETT, Steven Flat 12, Bishops Court Worsley Road Sunbury-on-Thames, TW16 7TW Middlesex / GB | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18203884.4 | 04.10.2011 | [2019/18] | Priority number, date | GB20100016684 | 04.10.2010 Original published format: GB 201016684 | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3477610 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/04, G08B29/04, G08B29/06, G08B26/00, G08B5/36, G08C23/04, H02H3/24, H02H7/20, H02J4/00 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
G08B25/045 (EP,US);
H02H7/268 (GB);
H02H3/24 (US);
G08B26/005 (EP,US);
G08B29/04 (US);
G08B29/043 (EP,US);
G08B29/06 (EP,US);
G08B5/36 (US);
G08C23/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Title | German: | TRENNSCHALTUNG | [2019/18] | English: | ISOLATOR CIRCUIT | [2019/18] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ISOLEMENT | [2019/18] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 01.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11784733.5 / EP2625677 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0191239 (GENT LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0224819 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US2001011892 (ROPKE GERHARD [DE]); | [A]US6838999 (ROEPKE GERHARD [DE]); | [A]US2008211658 (OPPELT ULRICH [DE]); | [I]US2010232080 (SCHERMANN HARALD [US], et al) |