EP3492749 - SHREDDING ASSEMBLY FOR A GRINDER PUMP AND CENTRIFUGAL GRINDER PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Management AG Neuwiesenstrasse 15 8401 Winterthur / CH | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burke, Michael Tenacre, Kilrane Rosslare Harbour Co Wexford / IE | 02 /
McDonald, Barry Milltown, Murrintown Co Wexford / IE | 03 /
Albadawi, Abdulaleem 31 Morrissons Avenue, Waterford Co Waterford / IE | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | IPS Irsch AG Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2024/03] |
Former [2019/23] | Intellectual Property Services GmbH Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 18203936.2 | 01.11.2018 | [2019/23] | Priority number, date | EP20170205075 | 04.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17205075 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492749 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3492749 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04D7/04, B02C18/00, F04D13/08, // F04D1/06 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
F04D7/045 (EP,US);
B02C18/0092 (EP,US);
B02C18/2225 (US);
F04D1/063 (EP,US);
F04D13/08 (EP,US);
F05D2250/294 (EP,US);
F05D2260/607 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] |
Former [2019/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZERKLEINERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE PUMPE MIT ZERKLEINERER UND ZENTRIFUGALPUMPE MIT ZERKLEINERER | [2019/23] | English: | SHREDDING ASSEMBLY FOR A GRINDER PUMP AND CENTRIFUGAL GRINDER PUMP | [2019/23] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE BROYAGE POUR POMPE DE BROYAGE ET POMPE DE BROYAGE CENTRIFUGE | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 05.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 16.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3650481 (CONERY WILLIAM J, et al); | [XYI]JPS63235690 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]DE19543916 (HAENY & CIE AG [CH]); | [Y]US2009067992 (KEENER ROBERT M [US]); | [XI]US2014263788 (VALLEN SHANE ROBERT [US], et al) | Examination | EP2754898 | by applicant | US4108386 | US5016825 | US7159806 | US7357341 |