EP3480850 - METHOD FOR MASS-PRODUCTION OF CURVED ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMBION, Bertrand 100 avenue du Granier Bat C 38530 PONTCHARRA / FR | 02 /
CAPLET, Stéphane 13 chemin des Marronnières 38360 SASSENAGE / FR | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18204634.2 | 06.11.2018 | [2019/19] | Priority number, date | FR20170060450 | 07.11.2017 Original published format: FR 1760450 | [2019/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480850 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H01L21/52 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H01L21/6836 (EP,US);
H01L27/14625 (US);
H01L21/52 (EP,US);
H01L27/14618 (EP,US);
H01L27/14634 (US);
H01L27/14683 (EP,US);
H10K71/80 (US);
H01L2221/68336 (EP,US);
H01L2221/6834 (EP,US);
H01L2224/95136 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MASSENPRODUKTION VON GEBOGENES ELEKTRONISCHEN SCHALTUNGEN | [2019/19] | English: | METHOD FOR MASS-PRODUCTION OF CURVED ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS | [2019/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION DE CIRCUITS ELECTRONIQUES COURBES | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 05.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2005191218 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2005260043 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2015192074 (SONY CORP); | [IY]US2016240582 (YAMAMOTO YUICHI [JP], et al); | [IY]WO2016161223 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US]) |