EP3484209 - MESH NETWORKING USING PEER TO PEER MESSAGES FOR A HOSPITALITY ENTITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 17900 Beeline Highway Jupiter, FL 33478 / US | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUENZI, Adam 4001 Fairview Industrial Drive SE Salem, Oregon 97302-1142 / US | 02 /
LANG, Michael 4001 Fairview Industrial Drive SE Salem, Oregon 97302-1142 / US | 03 /
SWITZER, Steve 581 Hardendorf Avenue Atlanta, Georgia 30307 / US | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 18204907.2 | 07.11.2018 | [2019/20] | Priority number, date | US201762583125P | 08.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762583125 P | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484209 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3484209 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/12, H04L45/16, H04W4/06, H04W40/00, H04W52/02, G07C9/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G07C9/00174 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (CN,US);
H04L51/08 (US);
G07C9/00571 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/16 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (US);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (CN,US);
H04W4/80 (CN);
H04W40/005 (EP);
H04W40/22 (US);
H04W40/244 (US);
H04W40/30 (US);
H04W52/0209 (EP,US);
H04W52/0225 (EP,US);
H04W52/0248 (CN);
H04W52/0251 (EP,US);
H04W8/005 (US);
G07C2009/00642 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/20] | H04W40/22, G07C9/00, H04W40/24, H04W52/02, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MESH-VERNETZUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON PEER-TO-PEER-NACHRICHTEN FÜR GASTFREUNDSCHAFTSEINHEIT | [2019/20] | English: | MESH NETWORKING USING PEER TO PEER MESSAGES FOR A HOSPITALITY ENTITY | [2019/20] | French: | MISE EN RÉSEAU MAILLÉE UTILISANT DES MESSAGES DE POSTE À POSTE POUR UNE ENTITÉ D'ACCUEIL | [2019/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 14.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2018 | AL | 24.08.2022 | AT | 24.08.2022 | BG | 24.08.2022 | CY | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | DK | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | ES | 24.08.2022 | FI | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | IT | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | MK | 24.08.2022 | MT | 24.08.2022 | NL | 24.08.2022 | PL | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SE | 24.08.2022 | SI | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | IE | 07.11.2022 | LU | 07.11.2022 | NO | 24.11.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | PT | 26.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 07.11.2018 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
BG | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 07.11.2018 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 07.11.2018 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 07.11.2018 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.11.2018 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017127222 (LANG MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,5-15 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0058] * [I] 2-4; | [A] - DARROUDI ET AL, "Bluetooth Low Energy Mesh Networks: A Survey", SENSORS, (20170622), vol. 17, no. 7, doi:10.3390/s17071467, page 1467, XP055565485 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Section 3.1; page 4 - page 5 * * Section 4.2; page 7 - page 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s17071467 | Examination | US2009135750 |