EP3572099 - OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pegavision Corporation 2F-1, No. 5, Shing Yeh Street Guishan District Taoyuan City 333 / TW | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TING, Wei-Jia 2F-1, No. 5, Shing Yeh St., Guishan Dist. 333 Taoyuan City / TW | 02 /
KUAN, Ting-Chun 2F-1, No. 5, Shing Yeh St., Guishan Dist. 333 Taoyuan City / TW | 03 /
LU, Shu-Chen 2F-1, No. 5, Shing Yeh St., Guishan Dist. 333 Taoyuan City / TW | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 18205167.2 | 08.11.2018 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | TW20180117948 | 25.05.2018 Original published format: TW 107117948 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572099 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61L12/08, C11D3/00, G02C13/00, G02C7/04, G02B1/04, A61L12/14 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
C11D3/0078 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (US);
A61K31/675 (US);
A61K31/714 (US);
A61K47/32 (US);
C11D1/123 (EP);
C11D1/74 (EP,US);
C11D3/042 (US);
C11D3/046 (US);
C11D3/1226 (EP);
C11D3/166 (EP);
C11D3/365 (EP);
C11D3/3784 (EP);
A61L12/04 (EP);
A61L12/142 (EP);
G02C7/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPHTHALMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2019/48] | English: | OPHTHALMIC COMPOSITION | [2019/48] | French: | COMPOSITION OPHTALMIQUE | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JPH10324634 (ROHTO PHARMA) [I] 1-3,5-13,16 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [ 0010] - [0015] * [Y] 1,4; | [IY]US2003186825 (MITANI MOTOHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-6,9-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [ 0018] , [ 0031] , [ 0052] , [ 0068] * [Y] 1,4; | [IY]US2008314767 (LAI YU-CHIN [US], et al) [I] 1-3,5-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0026] , [ 0042] - [0075] - [ 0087] , [ 0096] - [0098] * [Y] 1,4; | [A]US2009100801 (ZHAO FANG [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [IY]EP3040085 (NOF CORP [JP]) [I] 1-6,9-16 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] - [ 0028] , [ 0041] - [0047] * [Y] 1,4; | [XY]WO2017043500 (JSR CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,14,15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0029] - [ 0058] - [0062] - [ 0080] - [0082] - [0091] - [0103] - [ 0128] * [Y] 1; | [AP]US2018244911 (ISO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [AP] 1-16 * paragraphs [0017] - [0029] - [ 0058] - [0062] - [ 0080] - [0082] - [0091] - [0103] - [ 0128] * |