Designated contracting states | AL | |
AT | |
BE | |
BG | |
CH | |
CY | |
CZ | Lapse: 28.06.2023 |
DE | |
DK | |
EE | |
ES | |
FI | |
FR | |
GB | |
GR | Lapse: 29.09.2023 |
HR | Lapse: 28.06.2023 |
HU | |
IE | Lapse: 22.10.2023 |
IS | Lapse: 28.10.2023 |
IT | |
LI | |
LT | |
LU | |
LV | |
MC | Lapse: 28.06.2023 |
MK | |
MT | |
NL | |
NO | Lapse: 28.09.2023 |
PL | Lapse: 28.06.2023 |
PT | |
RO | Lapse: 28.06.2023 |
RS | Lapse: 28.06.2023 |
SE | |
SI | |
SK | Lapse: 28.06.2023 |
SM | Lapse: 28.06.2023 |
TR | |
Examination procedure | 15.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Fees paid | Renewal fee |
08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
European patent granted | 28.06.2023 |
Opposition procedure | 03.06.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | |
INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. |
Event date: | 26.06.2019 | |
Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT |
Validation States: | BA ME |
|
Event date: | 26.06.2019 | |
Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES |
Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 |
Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR |
|
Event date: | 26.06.2019 | |
Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION |
Ref Document Number: | 3060303 |
Country of Ref Document: | EP |
Kind Code of Ref Document: | P |
|
Event date: | 12.02.2020 | |
Event description: | REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED |
EXTENSION STATE: | BA |
Payment DATE: | 20200102 |
|
Event date: | 12.02.2020 | |
Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED |
Effective DATE: | 20200102 |
|
Event date: | 12.02.2020 | |
Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) |
Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR |
|
Event date: | 12.02.2020 | |
Event description: | REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED |
EXTENSION STATE: | ME |
Payment DATE: | 20200102 |
|
Event date: | 20.05.2020 | |
Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED |
Effective DATE: | 20200417 |
|
Event date: | 14.04.2020 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS |
|
Event date: | 10.01.2020 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE |
|
Event date: | 27.05.2019 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE APPLICATION HAS BEEN PUBLISHED |
|
Event date: | 27.05.2019 | |
Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 |
|
Event date: | 16.12.2020 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS |
|
Event date: | 20.09.2021 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS |
|
Event date: | 22.06.2022 | |
Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) |
OWNER: | TRANSLATE BIO, INC. |
|
Event date: | 04.01.2023 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 31/7105 20060101AFI20221201BHEP |
|
Event date: | 04.01.2023 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 38/53 20060101ALI20221201BHEP |
|
Event date: | 04.01.2023 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/127 20060101ALI20221201BHEP |
|
Event date: | 04.01.2023 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 48/00 20060101ALI20221201BHEP |
|
Event date: | 04.01.2023 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61P 3/00 20060101ALI20221201BHEP |
|
Event date: | 04.01.2023 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/51 20060101ALI20221201BHEP |
|
Event date: | 04.01.2023 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C12N 9/00 20060101ALI20221201BHEP |
|
Event date: | 09.01.2023 | |
Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 |
|
Event date: | 09.01.2023 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED |
|
Event date: | 01.02.2023 | |
Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED |
Effective DATE: | 20230110 |
|
Event date: | 15.05.2023 | |
Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 |
|
Event date: | 26.05.2023 | |
Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 |
|
Event date: | 26.05.2023 | |
Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT |
Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED |
|
Event date: | 01.12.2022 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG DE R079 602014087498 DE |
Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS |
Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61P0003000000 |
IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K0031710500 |
|
Event date: | 28.06.2023 | |
Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION |
Ref Document Number: | 3060303 |
Country of Ref Document: | EP |
Kind Code of Ref Document: | P |
|
Event date: | 28.06.2023 | |
Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES |
Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 |
Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR |
|
Event date: | 30.06.2023 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG CH EP |
Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI |
|
Event date: | 15.07.2023 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG AT REF 1582136 AT T |
Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) |
Effective DATE: | 20230715 |
|
Event date: | 19.07.2023 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG IE FG4D |
Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND |
|
Event date: | 20.07.2023 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG DE R096 602014087498 DE |
Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT |
|
Event date: | 30.08.2023 | |
Event description: | REQUEST FOR UNITARY EFFECT FILED |
Effective DATE: | 20230726 |
|
Event date: | 30.08.2023 | |
Event description: | UNITARY EFFECT REGISTERED |
Designated State(s): | AT BE BG DE DK EE FI FR IT LT LU LV MT NL PT SE SI |
Effective DATE: | 20230731 |
|
Event date: | 10.10.2023 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG LT MG9D |
Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENTS |
|
Event date: | 31.10.2023 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | NO |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230928 |
|
Event date: | 21.11.2023 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2954366 ES T3 |
Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION |
Effective DATE: | 20231121 |
|
Event date: | 29.11.2023 | |
Event description: | RENEWAL FEE FOR THE EUROPEAN PATENT WITH UNITARY EFFECT PAID |
Year of Fee Payment: | 10 |
Effective DATE: | 20231020 |
|
Event date: | 30.11.2023 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | GR |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230929 |
|
Event date: | 30.11.2023 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | HR |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230628 |
|
Event date: | 30.11.2023 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | RS |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230628 |
|
Event date: | 16.01.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | SK |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230628 |
|
Event date: | 23.01.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | IS |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20231028 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | CZ |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230628 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | IS |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20231028 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | RO |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230628 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | SK |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230628 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | SM |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230628 |
|
Event date: | 29.02.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | PL |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230628 |
|
Event date: | 29.03.2024 | |
Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 |
|
Event date: | 05.04.2024 | |
Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO |
|
Event date: | 28.03.2024 | |
Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE |
Event code: | REG DE R026 602014087498 DE |
Code Expl.: | -OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT |
|
Event date: | 11.04.2024 | |
Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 |
|
Event date: | 01.05.2024 | |
Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED |
OPPONENT: | AWA SWEDEN AB |
Effective DATE: | 20240328 |
|
Event date: | 08.05.2024 | |
Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) |
OPPONENT: | AWA SWEDEN AB |
Effective DATE: | 20240328 |
|
Event date: | 31.05.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | MC |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT |
Effective DATE: | 20230628 |
|
Event date: | 24.07.2024 | |
Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) |
OPPONENT: | AWA SWEDEN AB |
Effective DATE: | 20240328 |
|
Event date: | 20.06.2024 | |
Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO |
|
Event date: | 13.08.2024 | |
Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 |
|
Event date: | 18.09.2024 | |
Event description: | APPOINTED REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE UNITARY PATENT PROCEDURE CHANGED AFTER THE REGISTRATION OF THE UNITARY EFFECT |
REPRESENTATIVE: | CARPMAELS & RANSFORD LLP; GB |
|
Event date: | 10.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | IE |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES |
Effective DATE: | 20231022 |
|
Event date: | 14.10.2024 | |
Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | GB |
Payment DATE: | 20240829 |
Year of Fee Payment: | 11 |
|
Event date: | 16.10.2024 | |
Event description: | RENEWAL FEE FOR THE EUROPEAN PATENT WITH UNITARY EFFECT PAID |
Year of Fee Payment: | 11 |
Effective DATE: | 20240906 |
|
Event date: | 31.10.2024 | |
Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | IE |
Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES |
Effective DATE: | 20231022 |
|
Event date: | 28.01.2025 | |
Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | ES |
Payment DATE: | 20241105 |
Year of Fee Payment: | 11 |
|
Event date: | 31.01.2025 | |
Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] |
Ref Country Code: | CH |
Payment DATE: | 20241101 |
Year of Fee Payment: | 11 |
|
Event date: | 28.03.2025 | |
Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO |
|
Event date: | 04.04.2025 | |
Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED |
Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 |
|
Event date: | 30.04.2025 | |
Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) |
OPPONENT: | AWA SWEDEN AB |
Effective DATE: | 20240328 |
|