EP3483659 - IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUMURA, Shohei c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 18205339.7 | 09.11.2018 | [2019/20] | Priority number, date | JP20170217015 | 10.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017217015 | JP20180107034 | 04.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018107034 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483659 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G03G15/161 (EP,KR,US);
G03G15/11 (KR);
G03G15/50 (US);
G03G15/10 (US);
G03G21/0088 (US);
G03G13/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/20] | English: | IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [2019/20] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2019/20] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 15.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6269228 (KAYAHARA SHIN [JP], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [Y]JP3369322B (RICOH KK) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0 22] , [0 36]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]JP2003107924 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 37] , [0 50] , [0 53] , [ 5469] , [0 70]; figures 1-6 *; | [XY]US2003215269 (KAYAHARA SHIN [JP], et al) [X] 16 * paragraphs [0034] , [0 80] , [0 84] , [0 89] , [0 93] - [0103]; figures 1-33 * [Y] 1-15; | [A]EP2594999 (MIYAKOSHI PRINTING MACH [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2008508562 | JP2010066452 |