EP3502137 - ANTI-NERVE GROWTH FACTOR ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF PREPARING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoetis Services LLC 10 Sylvan Way Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2021/42] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Nexvet Australia Pty Ltd Level 8 31 Queen Street Melbourne VIC 3000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEARING, David 9 Meaden Street Southbank, Victoria 3006 / AU | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Wise, Daniel Joseph Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18205440.3 | 08.05.2012 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | GB20110014858 | 29.08.2011 Original published format: GB 201114858 | US201161531439P | 06.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161531439 P | US201161483481P | 06.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161483481 P | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502137 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/22, C07K16/46 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/18 (KR,RU);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61K38/19 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/42 (KR);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61K49/16 (KR);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/435 (KR);
C07K14/475 (KR);
C07K16/08 (CN);
C07K16/24 (CN);
C07K16/28 (CN,KR);
C07K16/30 (KR);
C07K16/467 (EP,RU,US);
C07K19/00 (KR,RU);
A61K2039/505 (CN);
C07K2317/24 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C07K2317/41 (CN,US);
C07K2317/51 (CN);
C07K2317/52 (CN);
C07K2317/70 (CN);
C07K2317/71 (CN,RU,US);
C07K2317/72 (CN,RU,US);
C07K2317/732 (CN);
C07K2317/734 (CN,US);
C07K2319/30 (RU)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN NERVENWACHSTUMSFAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/26] | English: | ANTI-NERVE GROWTH FACTOR ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF PREPARING AND USING THE SAME | [2019/26] | French: | ANTICORPS CONTRE LE FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE NEURONALE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 18.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12723730.3 / EP2705054 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 07.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03060080 (IDEXX LAB INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * example 5 *; | [A]WO2005061540 (LAY LINE GENOMICS SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-13 * sequence 17 *; | [Y]WO2006131951 (LAY LINE GENOMICS SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 5, line 4 - line 6 *; | [Y]WO2010027488 (VET THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0012] , [0011] , [0044] *; | [AP]WO2012024650 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [AP] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A] - PELAT THIBAUT ET AL, "Non-human primate immune libraries combined with germline humanization: an (almost) new, and powerful approach for the isolation of therapeutic antibodies", MABS,, (20090701), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 377 - 381, XP009135983 [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0006] * | [ ] - "Humanized alpha D11 antibody heavy chain variable region SEQ ID NO 17.", Geneseq, (20050908), Database accession no. AEB12537, URL: EBI, XP002679816 [ ] * sequence . * | [A] - COVACEUSZACH S ET AL, "Dissecting NGF Interactions with TrkA and p75 Receptors by Structural and Functional Studies of an Anti-NGF Neutralizing Antibody", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 381, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2008.06.008, ISSN 0022-2836, (20080912), pages 881 - 896, (20080610), XP023611489 [A] 1-13 * page 890 - column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2008.06.008 | [A] - ABE T ET AL, "Protective role of nerve growth factor against postischemic dysfunction of sympathetic coronary innervation.", CIRCULATION 7 JAN 1997 LNKD- PUBMED:8994439, (19970107), vol. 95, no. 1, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 213 - 220, XP002679817 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.95.1.213 | by applicant | US4376110 | EP0368684 | WO9222324 | US5831012 | US5852183 | WO9916873 | US6291158 | WO0220565 | US6582915 | US6593081 | WO2004044011 | US2005053973 | WO2006131951 | US7250297 | US2007191272 | - CATTANEO A., Curr. Op. Mol. Ther., (20100000), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 94 - 106 | - EISELE I.; WOOD IS.; GERMAN AJ.; HUNTER L.; TRAYHURN P., "Adipokine gene expression in dog adipose tissues and dog white adipocytes differentiated in primary culture", Hormone & Metabolic Research, (20050000), vol. 37, no. 8, pages 474 - 81 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. XP_540250 | - TANG L. et al., Veterinary Immunology and Immunopathology, (20010000), vol. 80, pages 259 - 270 | - CATTANEO A; RAPPOSELLI B; CALISSANO P., "Three distinct types of monoclonal antibodies after long-term immunization of rats with mouse nerve growth factor", J Neurochem, (19880000), vol. 50, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1471-4159.1988.tb10565.x, pages 1003 - 1010, XP009054657 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1471-4159.1988.tb10565.x | - RUBERTI, F. et al., "Cloning and Expression of an Anti-Nerve Growth Factor (NGF) Antibody for Studies Using the Neuroantibody Approach", Cellular and Molecular Neurobiology, (19930000), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00711464, pages 559 - 568, XP008113113 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00711464 | - KABAT et al., Ann. NY Acad, Sci., (19710000), vol. 190, pages 382 - 391 | - SAWAI et al., "Direct Production of the Fab Fragment Derived From the Sperm Immobilizing Antibody Using Polymerase Chain Reaction and cDNA Expression Vectors", AJRI, (19950000), vol. 34, pages 26 - 34 | - HUSTON et al., "Protein Engineering of Single-Chain Fv Analogs and Fusion Proteins", Methods in Enzymology, (19910000), vol. 203, pages 46 - 88, XP008120115 | - MORIMOTO et al., "Single-step purification of F(ab')2 fragments of mouse monoclonal antibodies (immunoglobulins G1 ) by hydrophobic interaction high performance liquid chromatography using TSKgel Phenyl-5PW", Journal of Biochemical and Biophysical Methods, (19920000), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-022X(92)90051-B, pages 107 - 117, XP023455149 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-022X(92)90051-B | - CARTER et al., "High level Escherichia coli expression and production of a bivalent humanized antibody fragment", Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0292-163, pages 163 - 167, XP001182085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0292-163 | - A. L. LEHNINGER, Biochemistry, Worth Publishers, (19750000), pages 73 - 75 | - "Molecular Cloning", SAMBROOK, A laboratory manual, cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (20010000), vol. 1-3 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - GENNARO, A.R., Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Lippincott Williams & Wilkins | - ANSEL, H.C. et al., Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms and Drug Delivery Systems | - RICHTER et al., Drug Metabolism and Disposition, (19980000), vol. 27, page 21 |