EP3486380 - FLUSH MOUNTING BODY FOR A SANITARY FITTING WITH A CABLE FEEDTHROUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grohe AG 58675 Hemer / DE | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lazic, Dajana Industriestraße 2a 58644 Iserlohn / DE | 02 /
Luig, Frank-Thomas Postfach 58708 Holzener Dorfstraße 57 Menden / DE | 03 /
Mainka, David Dahlbreite 20 58640 Iserlohn / DE | 04 /
Tüshaus, Jan Philipp Stormweg 10 58675 Hemer / DE | 05 /
Jung, Andreas Birkenweg 16 58730 Fröndenberg / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 18206028.5 | 13.11.2018 | [2019/21] | Priority number, date | DE201710127151 | 17.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017127151 | [2019/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3486380 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/02, H02G3/08 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
E03C1/021 (EP);
E03C1/023 (EP);
H02G3/083 (EP);
H02G3/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERPUTZEINBAUKÖRPER FÜR EINE SANITÄRARMATUR MIT EINER KABELDURCHFÜHRUNG | [2019/21] | English: | FLUSH MOUNTING BODY FOR A SANITARY FITTING WITH A CABLE FEEDTHROUGH | [2019/21] | French: | CORPS ENCASTRÉ POUR UNE ARMATURE SANITAIRE DOTÉ D'UN PASSAGE DE CÂBLE | [2019/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/18] | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102009012838 (HANSGROHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0042]; figure 4 * [Y] 4,5; | [XY]DE102007002235 (MORENT MARKUS [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0047]; figure 2 * [Y] 8; | [X]DE202011004387U (VIEGA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0057]; figures 2,5 *; | [X]US2991481 (BOOK HAROLD M) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * column 2, line 9 - column 11, line 8; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE202004016368U (SCHUECO INT KG [DE]) [Y] 4,5,8 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102005016340 (ADC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4,5,8 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0039]; figure 3b *; | [Y]DE102008064253 (IDEAL STANDARD INT BVBA [BE]) [Y] 1-5,8,9 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE3025603 (HANSA METALLWERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5,8,9 * page 6, line 32 - page 8, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * |