EP3485977 - CENTRIFUGE AND SWING-OUT ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eppendorf SE Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2023/17] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states Eppendorf AG Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜHNERT, Steffen Eppendorf AG Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
KÖHN, Heinz Gerhard Eppendorf AG Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Hecht, Jan-David, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Hecht Ranstädter Steinweg 28 04109 Leipzig / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 18206065.7 | 13.11.2018 | [2019/21] | Priority number, date | DE201710127039 | 16.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017127039 | [2019/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3485977 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3485977 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/04 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
B04B5/0421 (EP,US);
B04B2011/046 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGE UND AUSSCHWINGROTOR | [2019/21] | English: | CENTRIFUGE AND SWING-OUT ROTOR | [2019/21] | French: | CENTRIFUGEUSE ET ROTOR LIBRE | [2019/21] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 20.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | MC | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 23.08.2023 | |
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 23.08.2023 | |
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 23.08.2023 | |
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3028075 (JOSEF BLUM) [X] 1-4,6-10 * column 4, line 5 - line 13; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 5; | [X]US3377021 (FOX GERALD D, et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * column 3, line 9 - line 45; figure - *; | [Y]US4435168 (KENNEDY A TERENCE [US]) [Y] 5* column 4, line 20 - line 47; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE102006027680 (QIAGEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * paragraph [0207] - paragraph [0208]; figures 4,5a-c * |