Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11814300 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2023 | B2 | US2022048777 | 17.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18206150 | 14.11.2018 | WO2019EP80598 | 07.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210091228 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18206150 | 14.11.2018 | WO2019EP80598 | 07.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7379485B | Global Dossier | 14.11.2023 | B2 | JP2022507441 | 18.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18206150 | 14.11.2018 | WO2019EP80598 | 07.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113015695B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2024 | B | CN113015695 | 22.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18206150 | 14.11.2018 | WO2019EP80598 | 07.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020099242 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18206150 | 14.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3653578 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2021 | B1 | EP3653578 | 20.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18206150 | 14.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2874228T | 04.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP18206150 | 14.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI816915B | 01.10.2023 | B | TW202023951 | 01.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18206150 | 14.11.2018 |