EP3654142 - FIRST-PERSON PERSPECTIVE-MEDIATED REALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eronen, Antti Johannes Rintamäenkatu 13 A 6 33820 Tampere / FI | 02 /
Leppänen, Jussi Artturi Mielikinkatu 26 33580 Tampere / FI | 03 /
Lehtiniemi, Arto Lomarantatie 13 33880 Lempäälä / FI | 04 /
Mate, Sujeet Shyamsundar Nosturinraitti 2 A 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18206207.5 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654142 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06T15/20 (US);
G06F3/013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSPEKTIVISCH VERMITTELTE REALITÄT AUS DER ICH-PERSPEKTIVE | [2020/21] | English: | FIRST-PERSON PERSPECTIVE-MEDIATED REALITY | [2020/21] | French: | RÉALITÉ INDUITE PAR UNE PERSPECTIVE À LA PREMIÈRE PERSONNE | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 19.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014002444 (BENNETT DARREN [US], et al); | [A]EP3106963 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]); | [A]WO2017133933 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [X]US2018095542 (MALLINSON DOMINIC [US]); | [A]US2018143694 (LEPPÄNEN JUSSI [FI], et al) |